Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/25/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/02/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/02/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/02/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/02/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/02/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/02/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/24/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/24/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/24/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/24/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/24/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/24/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/24/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/24/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/24/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/24/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 02/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/24/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/24/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/03/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/17/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/17/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/18/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/18/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/18/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/18/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/18/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/18/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/18/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/18/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/18/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/18/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/28/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/28/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/28/1994