Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/09/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/09/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/09/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/09/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/09/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/09/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/22/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/22/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/03/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/03/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/09/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/09/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/09/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 03/16/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/16/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/12/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/20/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/20/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/20/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 04/20/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/25/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/25/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/25/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/25/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/25/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/25/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/25/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/25/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/25/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/25/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/26/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/28/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/28/1994