Text: H.J.Res.305 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/25/1994)

 
[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.J. Res. 305 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. J. RES. 305

         Designating April 28, 1994, as ``Exercise Tiger Day''.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            January 25, 1994

 Mr. Frank of Massachusetts introduced the following joint resolution; 
  which was referred to the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
         Designating April 28, 1994, as ``Exercise Tiger Day''.

Whereas the D-Day invasion of Normandy on June 6, 1944, was one of the most 
        critical and heroic battles leading to the Allied victory over Nazi 
        Germany in World War II;
Whereas, on April 28, 1944, during the Exercise Tiger training mission for D-
        Day, the soldiers and sailors of Exercise Tiger were unexpectedly 
        attacked by a flotilla of German torpedo boats off the coast of Slapton 
        Sands, England;
Whereas 749 American soldiers were killed in the attack;
Whereas the heroic efforts of these soldiers have not been sufficiently 
        recognized in American history and the soldiers of Exercise Tiger have 
        not been appropriately honored for their great sacrifice in defending 
        the Nation; and
Whereas April 28, 1994, will be the 50th anniversary of the tragedy of Exercise 
        Tiger: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That April 28, 1994, is 
designated as ``Exercise Tiger Day'', and the President is authorized 
and requested to issue a proclamation calling on the people of the 
United States to observe the day with appropriate ceremonies, 
activities, and programs.

                                 <all>

Share This Section