Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/23/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/23/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/03/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/03/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/03/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/10/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/10/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/22/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/22/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/22/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/22/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/22/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/22/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/19/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/19/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/19/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/19/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/19/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/19/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/19/1994