Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/22/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/22/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/22/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/22/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/13/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/13/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/14/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/1994