Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/11/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/11/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/11/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/24/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/24/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/07/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/07/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 03/07/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/07/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/07/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/07/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/07/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/07/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/07/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/07/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/07/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/07/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/10/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/10/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/16/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/1994
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/17/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/17/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 03/17/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/17/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/23/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/23/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 03/23/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/23/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/23/1994
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/23/1994