Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/23/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/08/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/08/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/08/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/14/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/19/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/19/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/19/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/21/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/21/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/21/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/03/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/03/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/03/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/03/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/03/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/10/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 05/10/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/11/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/17/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/17/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/20/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/25/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/25/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/12/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew