Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/24/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/24/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 02/24/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/02/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/02/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/02/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/02/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/02/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/09/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/09/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/14/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/14/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/14/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/21/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 05/04/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/04/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/04/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/04/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 05/04/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/04/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/04/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/04/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 05/04/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/04/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/11/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/11/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/14/1994