Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/12/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/12/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/26/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/26/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/26/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/26/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/26/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/26/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/05/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/05/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/05/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/05/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/17/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/17/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/17/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/17/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/17/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/17/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/17/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/17/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 05/17/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/17/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/17/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/17/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/17/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/17/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/17/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/24/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/24/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/24/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/24/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/24/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/24/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/24/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/24/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/24/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/24/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/24/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/24/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/24/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/24/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/24/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/24/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/24/1994