Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/16/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/16/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/16/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/17/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/17/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/17/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/22/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/22/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/22/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/22/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/23/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/12/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/12/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/12/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/12/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/12/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/13/1994