Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/24/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/24/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/24/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/24/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/24/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/26/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/26/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/26/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/26/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/11/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/11/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/26/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/15/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/19/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/19/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/27/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/05/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/17/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/17/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/17/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/22/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/22/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/29/1994