Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/18/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/12/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/19/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/19/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/19/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/19/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/19/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/19/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/19/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/19/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/19/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/19/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/20/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/20/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/20/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/20/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/20/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/21/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/21/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/21/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/21/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/21/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 04/21/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/26/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/26/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/26/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/26/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/26/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/26/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/26/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/26/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/26/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/02/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/02/1994