Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/23/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/14/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/14/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/14/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/14/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/14/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/20/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/20/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/20/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/20/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/20/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 04/28/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/28/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/28/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/28/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/28/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/28/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/28/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/28/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/28/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/28/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/28/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/28/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/28/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/28/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/28/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/28/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/28/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/28/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/28/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/28/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 04/28/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/28/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/28/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/05/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/05/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/05/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/05/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/05/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/05/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/05/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/17/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/17/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/17/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/17/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/17/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/17/1994