Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/19/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/19/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/19/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/19/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/16/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/16/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/27/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/27/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/27/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/27/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/27/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/27/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/27/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/27/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/12/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/12/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/12/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/19/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/19/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/19/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/19/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/22/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/22/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/22/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/22/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/22/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/22/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/22/1994