Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/24/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/13/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/13/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/13/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/13/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/30/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/30/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/30/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/30/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/30/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/30/1994
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 08/08/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/08/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/08/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/08/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 08/08/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/19/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/19/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/19/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/27/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/27/1994