Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/18/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/21/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/11/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/11/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/11/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/11/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/16/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/17/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 05/17/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/17/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/18/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/18/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/18/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/18/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/19/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/19/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/19/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/23/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/23/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/23/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/26/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/26/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/08/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/21/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/19/1994