Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/03/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/03/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/03/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/03/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/03/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/03/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/03/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/03/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/03/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/12/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/12/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/12/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/12/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/12/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/12/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/18/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/18/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/18/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/18/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/23/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/23/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/23/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/08/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/08/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/09/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/09/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/09/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/09/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/09/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/09/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/09/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/09/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/09/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 06/09/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/09/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/09/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/15/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/15/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/15/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/15/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/15/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/15/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/15/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/15/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/15/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/21/1994