Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/06/1994 Became Public Law No: 103-347.
10/06/1994 Signed by President.
09/26/1994 Presented to President.
09/21/1994 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
09/21/1994 Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13092)
07/25/1994 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/25/1994 Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
05/04/1994 Introduced in House