Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/18/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/18/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/18/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/26/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/14/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/14/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/14/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/29/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/29/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/29/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/29/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 06/29/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/01/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/01/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/01/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/01/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/01/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/01/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/01/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/01/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/01/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 08/01/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/01/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/01/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/1994
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/01/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/01/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 08/01/1994