There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commemorating June 22, 1994, as the 50th anniversary of the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/17/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/17/1994Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/17/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/21/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/21/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/21/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/21/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/22/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/22/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/22/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/22/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/22/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/23/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/23/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/23/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/28/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/28/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/28/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/30/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 07/12/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/21/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service06/17/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/17/1994)

Commemorates June 22, 1994, as the 50th anniversary of the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944.