Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/17/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/21/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/21/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/21/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/21/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/21/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/21/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/22/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/22/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/22/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/22/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/22/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/23/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/23/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/23/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/23/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/28/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/28/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/28/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/30/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 07/12/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/21/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1994