Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/22/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/22/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/22/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/22/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/22/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/22/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/09/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/09/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/17/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/17/1994