Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/27/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/27/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/27/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/30/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/30/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/30/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/30/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/30/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/03/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/03/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/03/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/03/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/03/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/03/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/09/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/19/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 08/19/1994