Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/20/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/20/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/20/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/03/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 08/03/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/03/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/10/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/10/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/10/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/10/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/12/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 08/12/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/23/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/23/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/23/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/23/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/26/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/28/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/28/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/29/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/29/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/29/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/29/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/30/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/30/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/30/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/03/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/03/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/03/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/03/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/05/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 10/07/1994