Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 08/20/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 08/20/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/20/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/20/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/20/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/20/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/20/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/20/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/20/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/30/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/30/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 09/30/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/30/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/30/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/30/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/30/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/30/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 09/30/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/30/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/03/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/03/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/03/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/03/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/03/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/03/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/03/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/03/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/04/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/04/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/04/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 10/04/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/04/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/04/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 10/04/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/04/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/04/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/04/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/04/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/04/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/04/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/04/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 10/04/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/04/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/04/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/04/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/04/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/07/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/07/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/07/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/1994