Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/19/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/21/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/24/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/24/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/20/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/26/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/26/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/28/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/03/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/11/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/11/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/23/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/30/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/13/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/26/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/16/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 09/20/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/23/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/26/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/07/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/29/1994