Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/21/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/21/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/21/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/26/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/26/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 01/26/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/26/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 01/26/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/26/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 01/26/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/03/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/23/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/23/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/02/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/02/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/1993