Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/25/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/25/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/25/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/25/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/02/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/02/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/02/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/02/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/02/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/02/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/02/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/02/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/02/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/17/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/17/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/30/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/30/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/30/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/30/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/30/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/30/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/04/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/04/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 05/04/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/04/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/04/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 05/04/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/04/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/18/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/18/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/18/1993