Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/02/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 03/01/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/01/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/01/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/01/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/01/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/01/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/01/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/01/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/01/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/01/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/01/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 03/01/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/01/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/01/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/01/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/01/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/01/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/01/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/01/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/01/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/01/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/01/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/01/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 03/01/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/01/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/01/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/01/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/01/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/01/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/01/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/01/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/10/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/10/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/10/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/10/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/10/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/10/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/10/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/10/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/10/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/10/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/10/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/10/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/10/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/16/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/16/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/16/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 03/16/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/16/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/16/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/16/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/16/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/16/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/16/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/16/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/16/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/16/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/16/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/16/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/16/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/18/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/18/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/18/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 03/18/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/25/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/31/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/31/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/19/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew