Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/29/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/29/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/05/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/05/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/24/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/24/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/28/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/30/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/30/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/30/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/20/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/21/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/05/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/05/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/08/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 09/08/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/08/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 09/08/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/08/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/08/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/08/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/08/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/09/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/09/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/13/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/13/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/22/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/28/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew