Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/26/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/26/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/26/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/15/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/15/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/28/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/02/1993