Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 05/19/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/19/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/10/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/10/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/10/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/10/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/10/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/10/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/10/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/10/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/18/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/24/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/24/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/28/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/28/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/28/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/28/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/29/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/29/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/29/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/29/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/29/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/29/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/29/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/29/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/29/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/29/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/29/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/29/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/29/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/29/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/29/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/29/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/29/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/01/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/01/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/01/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/01/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/15/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 08/02/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/12/1993