Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/27/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/09/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/09/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/09/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/09/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/09/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/09/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/09/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/09/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/09/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/09/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/18/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/18/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/01/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/21/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/21/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/21/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/21/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/26/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/26/1993