Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/10/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 06/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/16/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/18/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/22/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 07/22/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/22/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/22/1993