Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/13/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/13/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/13/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/21/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 09/27/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/27/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/27/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/27/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/27/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/27/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 11/22/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 11/22/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 11/22/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 11/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/22/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/22/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/22/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/22/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/22/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/22/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 01/25/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 01/25/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/25/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/25/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/03/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/23/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/23/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/23/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/23/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/23/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/23/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/23/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/03/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/03/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/03/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/03/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/03/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/03/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/03/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/09/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/09/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/09/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/09/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/09/1994