Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/13/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/13/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/13/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/13/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/14/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/14/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/15/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/23/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/23/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/15/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/15/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/27/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 11/10/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/21/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/21/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/24/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/23/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/17/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 06/29/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/19/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/05/1994