Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/06/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/06/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 10/06/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/06/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 10/06/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/27/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/27/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 10/27/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/21/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 04/20/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/18/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/20/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/25/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/02/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/04/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/09/1994