Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/23/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/14/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/19/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/19/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/25/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/25/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/14/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/28/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/28/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/29/1994