Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/19/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/01/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 08/01/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 08/01/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/01/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/01/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 08/01/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/01/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/01/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/01/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 08/01/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/01/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/01/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 08/01/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 08/01/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/01/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/01/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/01/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/12/1994