Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/26/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 05/26/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/26/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 05/26/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/26/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 05/26/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 05/26/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/08/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/08/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/10/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/10/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/10/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/10/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/10/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/13/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/13/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/13/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/15/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/15/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/15/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/15/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/16/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/16/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/16/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/16/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/16/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/16/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/16/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/21/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/21/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/21/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/21/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/21/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/22/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/23/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/23/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/29/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew