Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/10/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/24/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/24/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/24/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/24/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/24/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/12/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/21/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/21/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/21/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/21/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/21/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/26/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/26/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/01/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/01/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/09/1994