Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/12/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/12/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/12/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/19/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/22/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/26/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/26/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/26/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/26/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/26/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/26/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/29/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/29/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 08/05/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 08/10/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 08/10/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/10/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/10/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/17/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/17/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/13/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/13/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/13/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 09/22/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/22/1994