Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/30/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/26/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/26/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/26/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/26/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/26/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/26/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/26/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/26/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/26/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/30/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/30/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/30/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/30/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/30/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/30/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 09/30/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/30/1994
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/07/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 10/07/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 11/29/1994