Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 08/12/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 08/12/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 08/12/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/19/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/21/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/28/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/07/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/07/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/07/1994