There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to welfare reform legislation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/18/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
08/23/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
08/18/1994Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
08/18/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8600)
08/18/1994Introduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/18/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/18/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/29/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/29/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/30/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/30/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/30/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/30/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/30/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/30/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/05/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 10/06/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means08/18/1994 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources08/23/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.525.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.525. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/18/1994)

Declares that any welfare reform legislation that passes the House of Representatives should: (1) result in net savings to the U.S. taxpayer within five years; (2) limit increases in aggregate spending for welfare programs to the rate of inflation; (3) not require any new taxes; (4) not increase the Federal deficit by more than the amount by which it would increase in the absence of the legislation; and (5) not require State or local governments to bear any administrative costs that would not be borne by such governments in the absence of the legislation.