Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/18/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/18/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 08/18/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/29/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/29/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/30/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/30/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/30/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/30/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/30/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/30/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/05/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 10/06/1994