Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/23/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/27/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/27/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/27/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/27/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/27/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/27/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/27/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/27/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/30/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/30/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/30/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/30/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/30/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/30/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/30/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/30/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/30/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/29/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/29/1994