Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 05/26/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/26/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/22/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/07/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/27/1994