Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 05/26/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/17/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/29/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/11/1994