Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/27/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/27/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/27/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/22/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/22/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/29/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/28/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/28/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/04/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/20/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/23/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/23/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/09/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/09/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/09/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/22/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/22/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/13/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/13/1994